HI HB986 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain employers with fifty or more employees to provide sick leave to service workers for specified purposes under certain conditions. Defines the terms "service worker" and "employer". Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
Relating To Labor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB986 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4
HB986 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=986&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB986_.HTM |