HI HB988 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 074, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 074, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements section 106 of the Economic Growth, Regulatory Relief, and Consumer Protection Act, P.L. 115-174, by providing a 120-day temporary authority to originate loans in this State for loan originators moving from a depository institution to a non-depository institution and state-licensed loan originators moving interstate. (HB988 CD1)
Title
Relating To Transitional Authority In The Mortgage Industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 074, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 074, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 21). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 21) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Hashimoto, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-19 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Hashimoto Co-Chairs; Cachola, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 807) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1946) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 433). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.