HI HCR10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL, with Senator Slom voting "No".
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL, with Senator Slom voting "No".
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Propose A Constitutional Amendment To Overturn The United States Supreme Court's Holding Relating To Corporate Independent Expenditures In Citizens United V. Federal Election Commission.
Title
Citizens United V. Federal Election Commission; Corporate Campaign Spending
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL, with Senator Slom voting "No". |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1612), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-13 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 412). |
2013-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 12 |
2013-01-22 | House | Offered |
2013-01-18 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=10&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR10_.HTM |