HI HCR113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor And Mayor Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Affirm The Safe Access Oahu Program Will Not Be Unnecessarily Extended Beyond The March 5, 2022, Sunset Date.
Title
Requesting The Governor And Mayor Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Affirm The Safe Access Oahu Program Will Not Be Unnecessarily Extended Beyond The March 5, 2022, Sunset Date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 27
HCR113 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25
HCR113 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=113&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR113_.HTM |