HI HCR117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR117
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Immediately Cease Intercepting Social Security Payments For Children In Foster Care.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Immediately Cease Intercepting Social Security Payments For Children In Foster Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 914). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-26-22. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4061) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 380). |
2022-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan excused (5). |
2022-04-01 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR117 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR117 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25
HCR117 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25