HI HCR128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor Of The State Of Hawaii To Convene A Task Force To Review Policies And Procedures For State Funded Drug Coverage Programs And Services.
Title
Task Force; Policy; Regulation of Pharmacy Benefit Management Companies; Patients Right to Select Their Own Pharmacy Provider
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 672). | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) One Day Notice 04-27-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Waived referral to HTH, WAM. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1708) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Marumoto, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Re-referred to LAB/HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 54 | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from LAB/HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB/HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 03-29-11 10:10AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Referred to LAB/HUS/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39 | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-14 | (H) To be offered. |