HI HCR130 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress To Support The Construction Of A Memorial Commemorating The War In The Pacific At The Pearl Harbor Visitor Center.
Title
"War in the Pacific" Memorial; Pearl Harbor Visitor Center; World War II Valor in the Pacific National Monument
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2013-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 729) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WAM. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, McDermott. |
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 47 |
2013-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-03-13 11:05AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=130&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR130_.HTM |