HI HCR131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to ETT/JDC.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to ETT/JDC.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The International Olympic Committee, International Paralympic Committee, United States Olympic Committee, And The Tokyo Organising Committee Of The Olympic And Paralympic Games To Encourage Olympic And Paralympic Athletes To Train In Hawaii For The 2020 Summer Olympics And The 2020 Summer Paralympics.
Title
Urging The International Olympic Committee, International Paralympic Committee, United States Olympic Committee, And The Tokyo Organising Committee Of The Olympic And Paralympic Games To Encourage Olympic And Paralympic Athletes To Train In Hawaii For The 2020 Summer Olympics And The 2020 Summer Paralympics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to ETT/JDC. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 438). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1794-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, LoPresti. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:15AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR117 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR131 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
HCR131 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=131&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR131_.HTM |