HI HCR135 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - The committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - The committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Establish A Health Care Task Force Within The Insurance Division To Develop A Plan To Improve The Delivery Of Health Care In The State.
Title
DCCA Health Care Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-28-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-28-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:35PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=135&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR135_.HTM |