HI HCR138 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Take Action Regarding The Separation Of Commercial And Investment Banking Functions Through The Reinstatement Of The Glass-steagall Act Of 1933 Or Similar Legislation.
Title
Return to Prudent Banking Act; Glass-Steagall Act of 1933
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR108 (Same As) 2013-04-02 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=138&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR138_.HTM |