HI HCR14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to ENE/WTL/PSM.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to ENE/WTL/PSM.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States To Recognize The Recovery Of Hawaiian Green Sea Turtles And Begin Active Management Of This Important Species.
Title
Hawaiian Green Sea Turtle; Active Management; Endangered Species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to ENE/WTL/PSM. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 70). |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-20 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Wooley voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2013-02-20 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637), recommending adoption. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:50AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to OMH, referral sheet 12 |
2013-01-22 | House | Offered |
2013-01-19 | House | To be offered. |