HI HCR14 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Older Americans Act And Designating May As "older Americans Month" In Hawaii.
Title
Older Americans Act; Older Americans Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 640). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-15. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-15 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to HSH. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340). |
2015-03-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8). |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 944), recommending adoption. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro. |
2015-03-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-17-15 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to HUS, referral sheet 7 |
2015-01-26 | House | Offered |
2015-01-23 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR4 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Report adopted, referred to HEA.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=14&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR14_.HTM |