HI SCR4 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Report adopted, referred to HEA.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Report adopted, referred to HEA.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Older Americans Act And Designating May As "older Americans Month" In Hawaii.
Title
Older Americans Act; Older Americans Month
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to HEA. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906), with recommendation of referral to HEA. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-05-15 2:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-05-15 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, HEA. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR14 (Same As) 2015-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=4&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR4_.HTM |