HI HCR14 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR14
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Identify Possible State-owned Land And Establish A Public-private Partnership To Build A Race Track Facility On The Island Of Oahu.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Identify Possible State-owned Land And Establish A Public-private Partnership To Build A Race Track Facility On The Island Of Oahu.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-01-26 | House | Offered |
2018-01-24 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR14 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).
SCR20 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
SCR20 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Public-private Partnership
Race Track Facility
State-Owned Land
Public-private Partnership
Race Track Facility
State-Owned Land
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=14&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR14_.HTM |