HI HCR15 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HRE/HMS.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HRE/HMS.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Convene A Hawaii State Fall Prevention Task Force To Develop A Statewide Approach To Reducing Falls Among Older Adults.
Title
Fall Prevention Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to HRE/HMS. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1284-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-18-10 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2010-01-20 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR12 (Same As) 2010-04-07 - (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har.