HI HCR156 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Management Audit Of The Child Welfare Services Branch Of The Social Services Division Of The Department Of Human Services.
Title
Management Audit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-20-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR117 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=156&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR156_.HTM |