HI HCR157 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study On The Feasibility And Benefits Of Establishing Certification And Licensure Fees To Support Certain Department Of Human Services' Programs.
Title
Department of Human Services; Certification and Licensure Fee; Study; Feasibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 597). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1771-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1459-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR121 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.