HI HCR163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR163
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Federal Communications Commission, The Federal Emergency Management Agency, And The National Weather Service To Make Necessary Updates To Ensure That Textual And Audible Information From The Emergency Alert System Are Matched And Synchronized During Television Broadcasts.
Title
Urging The Federal Communications Commission, The Federal Emergency Management Agency, And The National Weather Service To Make Necessary Updates To Ensure That Textual And Audible Information From The Emergency Alert System Are Matched And Synchronized During Television Broadcasts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Choy, Woodson, Ward. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Thielen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to PBS/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR139 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR163 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH.
HCR163 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=163&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR163_.HTM |