HI HCR166 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR166
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kapaa, Kawaihau, Kauai, For Construction Of A Sandbag Groin And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kapaa, Kawaihau, Kauai, For Construction Of A Sandbag Groin And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 631). |
2021-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (4). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement (Hse. Com. No. 622) |
2021-04-22 | House | Deferred one day 04-23-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 837) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1736), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 1:30PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 384). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-23-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR166 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR113 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR113 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.