HI HCR168 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Working Group To Streamline The State's Workers' Compensation Process.
Title
Workers' Compensation; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5). |
2015-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 658) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-23-15. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-15 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 410). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2015-03-27 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR104 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.