HI HCR169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Establishment Of Koreatown And Development Of A Master Plan For The Development Of A Koreatown.
Title
Koreatown; Office of Planning; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 792) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Reported from WLH/TSM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3548) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kahele. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/TSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to WLH/TSM/TIA. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 601). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Awana, Belatti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Kawakami, Souki, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Floor amendment adopted as amended HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Chang, Kawakami, Tokioka excused. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Floor Amendment No. 6 offered by Rep. Har | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Thursday, 04-12-12 11:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-02-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-30-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |