HI HCR169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR169
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Convene An Economic Development And Tax Reform Working Group To Study, Among Other Things, The Economic Outcome Of Transferring The Authority To Tax Real Property Back To The State And Allocating A Portion Of General Excise Tax Revenues To The Counties.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Convene An Economic Development And Tax Reform Working Group To Study, Among Other Things, The Economic Outcome Of Transferring The Authority To Tax Real Property Back To The State And Allocating A Portion Of General Excise Tax Revenues To The Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to ETT/PSM, WAM. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 431). |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-22-17 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR169 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=169&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR169_.HTM |