HI HCR171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR171
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Study The Adequacy Of Insurance Coverage Requirements For Transportation Network Companies And Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Title
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Study The Adequacy Of Insurance Coverage Requirements For Transportation Network Companies And Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1649-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Johanson, Mizuno, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR171 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30