HI HCR171 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR171
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Public Safety To Recognize The Value Of Culture-based Rehabilitation Activities In The State's Correctional System.
Title
Urging The Department Of Public Safety To Recognize The Value Of Culture-based Rehabilitation Activities In The State's Correctional System.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-16 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 805). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-21. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1744) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 386). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1582), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 03-19-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR171 (Carry Over) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.