HI HCR174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging President Barack Obama To Select A Location In Hawaii As The Site For His Presidential Library.
Title
Presidential Library; Barack Obama
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-28 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 655). | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-27 | (S) One Day Notice 04-28-10. | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3236) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-23-10 10:30AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 503). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee, Mizuno excused. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Berg, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Takai, Tsuji, Wooley, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-22-10 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-05 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.