HI HCR175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Restore The Presumption Of A Service Connection For Agent Orange Exposure To United States Veterans Who Served In The Waters Defined By The Combat Zone And In The Airspace Over The Combat Zone In Vietnam.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Restore The Presumption Of A Service Connection For Agent Orange Exposure To United States Veterans Who Served In The Waters Defined By The Combat Zone And In The Airspace Over The Combat Zone In Vietnam.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1687-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Tokioka, Ward. |
2018-03-22 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 03-23-18 10:15AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR147 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR175 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, IAC/CPC, referral sheet 30
HCR175 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, IAC/CPC, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=175&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR175_.HTM |