HI HCR176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR176
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Work With The United States Department Of Veterans Affairs To Develop A Program Or Pass Legislation To Provide Veterans From Compact Of Free Association Nations With Access To High-quality Medical Care Within Their Respective Communities.
Title
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Work With The United States Department Of Veterans Affairs To Develop A Program Or Pass Legislation To Provide Veterans From Compact Of Free Association Nations With Access To High-quality Medical Care Within Their Respective Communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from VMI/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2017-03-24 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by VMI/HLT on Tuesday, 03-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI/HLT on Tuesday, 03-28-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to VMI/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR176 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=176&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR176_.HTM |