HI HCR18 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study To Advise The Special Action Team On The Optimal Number Of Forensic Examinations Necessary For Felony Cases.
Title
Special Action Team; Forensic Examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-12 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2013-03-01 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-03-01 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 03-01-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, JUD, referral sheet 12 |
2013-01-24 | House | Offered |
2013-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR13 (Same As) 2013-02-13 - Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM.