HI HCR18 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR18
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene A Working Group To Review Afterschool Programs In Hawaii's Public Schools And To Establish An Afterschool Program Advisory Council.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene A Working Group To Review Afterschool Programs In Hawaii's Public Schools And To Establish An Afterschool Program Advisory Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-02-02 | House | Offered |
2018-02-01 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR15 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309.
SCR13 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
SR9 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HCR18 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).
SCR13 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
SR9 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HCR18 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=18&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR18_.HTM |