HI HCR181 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to WTL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to WTL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Land Division, To Develop A Plan To Redirect Storm Water Runoff From State Lands Adjacent To The Hanapepe Salt Ponds Away From The Salt Pans.
Title
Hanapepe Salt Ponds; Runoff
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 504). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Chong, Coffman, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Herkes. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-29-10 10:45AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-08 | (H) To be offered. |