HI HCR181 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR181
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating April As Tree Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Title
Designating April As Tree Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR160 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR181 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to PVM/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR181 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to PVM/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=181&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR181_.HTM |