HI HCR196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Consult Beneficiaries Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act Regarding Alternative Waitlist And Award Prioritization Based On Lineal And Generational Descendancy For Hawaiian Home Lands Located In Hana, Maui.
Title
Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Consult Beneficiaries Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act Regarding Alternative Waitlist And Award Prioritization Based On Lineal And Generational Descendancy For Hawaiian Home Lands Located In Hana, Maui.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2024-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-26 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-25 | House | One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24. |
2024-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 755) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3888) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-24 1:15PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HWN/JDC. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1719-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Souza. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR176 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.