HI HR176 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Consult Beneficiaries Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act Regarding Alternative Waitlist And Award Prioritization Based On Lineal And Generational Descendancy For Hawaiian Home Lands Located In Hana, Maui.
Title
Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Consult Beneficiaries Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act Regarding Alternative Waitlist And Award Prioritization Based On Lineal And Generational Descendancy For Hawaiian Home Lands Located In Hana, Maui.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1718-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Souza. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR196 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=176&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR176_.HTM |