HI HCR197 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Federal Government To Enhance Its Enforcement Of Federal Laws Prohibiting The Sale Of Ivory.
Title
Enforcement of Federal Prohibition of Ivory Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 485). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1392-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Ito, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2014-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-27 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-31-14 at 2:00 pm in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Re-referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 42 |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR157 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=197&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR197_.HTM |