HI HCR20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Perform A Sunrise Analysis Of The Regulation Of The Profession Of Music Therapy.
Title
Music Therapy; Auditor; Sunrise Review
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 52 | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CUA on Monday, 03-28-11 11:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to CUA, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2011-01-27 | (H) To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=20 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR20_.HTM |