HI HCR205 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Waive All Fines Related To The Construction And Demolition Of The Kupuna Terrace In Waimanalo.
Title
Kupuna Terrace; City and County of Honolulu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR160 (Same As) 2012-03-28 - (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=205 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HCR205_.HTM |