HI HCR209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Hawaii State Executive Office On Aging Update The 2013 White Paper On Active Aging And Provide A Final Report On Its Updated Version No Later Than The Start Of The Regular Session Of 2022.
Title
Requesting That The Hawaii State Executive Office On Aging Update The 2013 White Paper On Active Aging And Provide A Final Report On Its Updated Version No Later Than The Start Of The Regular Session Of 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1872) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Ward. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR188 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).