HI HCR211 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Developmental Screening Task Force To Review Early Childhood Developmental Screening Pilot Projects, And Make Recommendations For The Development Of An Early Childhood Developmental Screening System In Hawaii.
Title
Early Childhood Developmental Screening; Department of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR182 (Same As) 2011-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=211 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR211_.HTM |