HI HR182 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Human Services To Consider Implementing A Computer Application For Foster Youth Who Are Transitioning Out Of The Foster Care System.
Title
Department of Human Services; Foster Youth; My Safe Drawer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR211 (Same As) 2011-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=182 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR182_.HTM |