HI HCR244 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That A Loi Be Established On The Grounds Of The State Capitol.
Title
Capitol Grounds; Taro Cultivation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-17-10 10:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 48 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR172 (Same As) 2010-04-07 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WLO as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Aquino, Hanohano, Har, M. Oshiro, Sagum, Souki excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=244&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HCR244_.HTM |