HI HCR25 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR25
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Maunalua, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Seawall, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Maunalua, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Seawall, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 815). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1731), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 1:30PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 337). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-27 | House | Offered |
2021-01-25 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR25 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR19 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR19 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).