HI HCR27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kukuiula, Koloa, Kauai, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Rock Seawall, And For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
BLNR; Tax Map Key: (4) 2-6-012
Sponsors
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 418). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Wednesday, 03-23-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2016-01-27 | House | Offered |
2016-01-26 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=27&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR27_.HTM |