HI HCR34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR34
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assess And Report To The Legislature Whether And To What Extent Existing Curriculum And Training Align With Erin's Law.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assess And Report To The Legislature Whether And To What Extent Existing Curriculum And Training Align With Erin's Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23 |
2022-03-08 | House | Offered |
2022-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR29 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
HCR34 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR216 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR34 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR216 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=34&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR34_.HTM |