HI HCR37 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Perpetual, Nonexclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands Located In Kapahulu, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of An Existing Seawall And Steps.
Title
Submerged Land Easement
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 714). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-10-13 9:51AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1240), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 140). |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744), recommending adoption. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:50AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, referral sheet 20 |
2013-02-06 | House | Offered |
2013-02-05 | House | To be offered. |