HI HCR37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR37
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Convene A Blue Ribbon Reconciliation Commission To Examine And Formulate A Reconciliation Process Relating To Issues Of Past, Present, And Future Importance To The Native Hawaiian People, The State Of Hawaii, And The United States Of America.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Convene A Blue Ribbon Reconciliation Commission To Examine And Formulate A Reconciliation Process Relating To Issues Of Past, Present, And Future Importance To The Native Hawaiian People, The State Of Hawaii, And The United States Of America.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Monday, 02-10-20 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to WLH, referral sheet 20 |
2020-02-05 | House | Offered |
2020-02-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR37 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).