HI HCR39 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR39
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Commission A Monument To President Barack Obama.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Commission A Monument To President Barack Obama.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1736), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:15AM in conference room 312. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-07 | House | Offered |
2019-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR39 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=39&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR39_.HTM |