HI HCR74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR74
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Employees' Retirement System To Enforce The Issuance Of Fines To State And County Departments And Agencies That Fail To Submit Audited Retired Employee Unused Sick Leave Credits And Other Personnel Information To The Employees' Retirement System In A Timely Manner.
Title
Urging The Employees' Retirement System To Enforce The Issuance Of Fines To State And County Departments And Agencies That Fail To Submit Audited Retired Employee Unused Sick Leave Credits And Other Personnel Information To The Employees' Retirement System In A Timely Manner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR59 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR74 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
HCR74 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=74&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR74_.HTM |