HI HCR74 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Facilitation Of A Path To Citizenship For Immigrants From Parties To The Compacts Of Free Association.
Title
Encouraging The Facilitation Of A Path To Citizenship For Immigrants From Parties To The Compacts Of Free Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Elijah Pierick [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891). |
2023-04-27 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-27 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1). |
2023-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2023-04-25 | House | One (1) day notice, Thursday, 04-27-23. |
2023-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 958) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-23. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1963) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 622). |
2023-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1962), recommending adoption. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama, Kong. |
2023-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
2023-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR75 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.