HI HCR76 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Examine Wwoofing In Hawaii, Review Relevant Hawaii Labor Laws, And Make Recommendations.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Examine Wwoofing In Hawaii, Review Relevant Hawaii Labor Laws, And Make Recommendations.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2017-03-24 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen. |
2017-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-24-17 8:31AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR/LAB, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Offered |
2017-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR76 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR42 (Same As) 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR42 (Same As) 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.