HI HCR76 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Convene A Working Group To Identify High Priority Areas For Potential Designation As Marine Managed Areas.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Convene A Working Group To Identify High Priority Areas For Potential Designation As Marine Managed Areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR62 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR76 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR61 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR76 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR61 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=76&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR76_.HTM |